Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/07/2018 at 19:08:33 (UTC).

IN RE BRUCE EVERETT HARDY

Case Summary

On 12/08/2010 IN RE BRUCE EVERETT HARDY was filed as a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6644

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT

Respondents

ONE .12 GAUGE OLIN-MATHEIESON CORP./WINCHES

ONE 9MM GLOCK INC SEMI-AUTOMATIC PISTOL MOD

ONE .25 CALI BER BERETTA USA CORP./BRONCO SE

BRUCE EVERETT HARDY

Other

DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEST BEST & KRIEGER LLP

2855 East Guasti Road Suite 400

Ontario, CA 91761

Other Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

Attn: Kristen Caine 316 N Mountain View Ave

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/JUDGMENT FILED BY FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • ORDER OF DEFAULT ON PETITION SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERMINATION RE: RETURN OF DEADLY WEAPONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CHRISTOPHER B MARSHALL, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BENJAMIN KEARNS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: BRUCE EVERETT HARDY; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON PETITION FOR RETURN OF FIREARM.; COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER SUBMITS ON PLEADINGS.; BRUCE EVERETT HARDY NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; JUDGMENT ON OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 12/08/2010 OF FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT ORDERED ENTERED 01/25/11; JUDGMENT FOR: FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRUCE EVERETT HARDY, ONE .25 CALI BER BERETTA USA CORP./BRONCO SE, ONE 9MM GLOCK INC SEMI-AUTOMATIC PISTOL MOD, ONE .12 GAUGE OLIN-MATHEIESON CORP./WINCHES, DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF SANBERNARDINO; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: THAT ONE (1).25 CALIBER BERETTA USA CORP./BRONCO SEMI-AUTOMATIC PISTOL,; MODEL 21A, SERIAL NUMBER BES26467V; ONE (1)9MM BLOCK, INC. SEMI-AUTOMATIC PISTOL, MODEL 17,; SERIAL NUMBER BKN194US; AND ONE (1).12 GAUGE OLIN-MATHIESON CORP./WINCHESTER/WINGO PUMP; ACTION SHOTGUN, MODEL 1200 DEFN, SERIAL NUMBER L2016249 ARE HEREBY FORFEITED BY DEFAULT TO THE; FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT, AND THAT SAID DEADLY WEAPONS ARE SUBJECT TO DISPOSITION PURSUANT TO; SECTIONS 12028 AND 12032 OF THE PENAL CODE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; CASE DISPOSITIONED BY JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN A KEARNS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT ORDER OF FORFEITURE RE WEAPONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION RE RETURN OF DEADLY WEAPON FILED AS TO BRUCE EVERETT HARDY. PARTY SERVED ON 12/08/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • NOTICE OF STATUS HRG ON PTN RE RETURN OF DEADLY WEAPON FILED BY FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DECLARATION OF OFFICER RYN IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • MENTAL HEALTH CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant