This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 10:34:27 (UTC).

IN RE BRITANY NOVAK

Case Summary

On 02/23/2015 IN RE BRITANY NOVAK was filed as a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0014

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT

Respondents

ONE CROCODILE MACHETE WITH 24 INCH BLADE

ONE 12 GAUGE KESSLER ARMS CORP. SHOTGUN

BRITANY NOVAK

ONE .22 CALIBER SAVAGE ARMS CORP. RIFLE,

ONE DIAMOND ARMS CO SHOTGUN, MODEL SINGLE

Other

SAN BERNARDINO DISTRICT ATTORNEY

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEST BEST & KRIEGER

2855 East Guasti Road Suite 400

Ontario, CA 91761

Other Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY

303 W Third St. Fifth Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/JUDGMENT FILED BY ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: ORDER SUBMITTED TO THE COURT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • ORDER OF DEFAULT ON PETITION SEEKING JUDICIAL DETERMINAT ION RE: RETURN OF DEADLY WEAPONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DECLARATION OF DANA M VESSEY ISO DEFAULT ORDER OF FORFEITURE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/STATUS HEARING; Minutes; PLEASE SEE ATTACHED NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND STATUS HEARING SET FOR THE ABOVE ENTITLED ACTION.; THANK YOU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DISTRICT ATTORNEY SAN BERNARDINO IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR SAN BERNARDINO DISTRICT ATTORNEY, AND DISTRICT ATTORNEY IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • ON OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 02/23/2015 OF ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT FOR SAN BERNARDINO DISTRICT ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY DISTRICT ATTORNEY ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • NOTICE OF STATUS HEARING FILED BY ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PET TO RETURN DEADLY FIREARMS FILED AS TO BRITANY NOVAK. PARTY SERVED ON 02/23/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT ARE WAIVED FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • ON OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 02/23/2015 OF ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT FOR SAN BERNARDINO DISTRICT ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY DISTRICT ATTORNEY SAN BERNARDINO ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • DECLARATION OF OFFICER KYLE HANKINN IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • MENTAL HEALTH CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • ON THE OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 02/23/2015 OF ONTARIO POLICE DEPARTMENT, SAN BERNARDINO DISTRICT ATTORNEY IS ADDED AS A THIRD PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.