Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 11:47:16 (UTC).

IN RE: AUDREY LEE GREEN

Case Summary

On 12/14/2011 IN RE AUDREY LEE GREEN was filed as a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4310

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Respondent

AUDREY LEE GREEN

Other

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O.Box 168048 Attn:Firearms Prohibition & Reporting Unit

Sacramento, CA 95816-8048

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

Attn: Kristen Caine 316 N Mountain View Ave

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Other Attorney

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE BUREAU OF FIREARMS

P.O.Box 168048 Attn:Firearms Prohibition & Reporting Unit

Sacramento, CA 95816-8048

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2012
  • MEDICAL RECORDS DESTROYED 06/07/12 PER COURT ORDER ON 06/06/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO W&I 8103; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: TRENESHA BEAMON; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; 09:09; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY DA TIMOTHY DIXON PRESENT.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: AUDREY LEE GREEN; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; IN-CAMERA HEARING HELD.; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY THE PETITIONER:; COURT DENIES PETITION FOR ORDER TO OWN, POSSESS, CONTROL, RECEIVE AND PURCHASE FIREARMS.; THE COURT ORDERS MEDICAL REPORTS FROM ARROWHEAD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER FOR AUDREY LEE GREEN; DESTROYED.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT FINDING, AFTER COURT TRIAL (MENTAL HEALTH); DISPOSITION COURT FINDING, AFTER COURT TRIAL (MENTAL HEALTH); STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION DENIED; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • FILE RETAINED IN DEPARTMENT FOR FUTURE HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO W&I 8103; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; WILFRED J. SCHNEIDER, JUDGE; CLERK: ANCHALEE M PRICE; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; APPEARANCES:; AUDREY LEE GREEN PRESENT IN PRO PER.; ATTORNEY TIMOTHY DIXON PRESENT FOR PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE BUREAU OFFIREARMS FOR DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; IN-CAMERA HEARING HELD.; 09:15; PARTIES MEET AND CONFER OUTSIDE THE PRESENCE OF THE COURT.; 09:20; COUNSEL FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA REQUEST ADDITIONAL TIME TO RETRIEVE BACKGROUND; INFORMATION.; 09:32; COUNSEL AND PARTIES PRESENT.; 09:40; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT INFORMS AUDREY GREEN THAT A MEDICAL REPORT/EVALUTION IS NEEDED TO MAKE A; DETERMINATION.; THIS HEARING CONTINUED FOR AUDREY GREEN TO BRING ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS TO ASSIST THE COURT IN; EVALUTIING THE DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR RELIEF.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/06/12 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • CONFIDENTIAL MEDICAL RECORDS RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO S31.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • FILE RETAINED IN DEPARTMENT S31 FOR 3/6/12 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO W&I 8103; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; WILFRED J. SCHNEIDER, JUDGE; CLERK: KATHLEEN SAENZ; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; RESPONDENT AUDREY LEE GREEN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION TO ALLOW A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DISTRICT; ATTORNEYS OFFICE TO BE PRESENT.; THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE RECORDS OF AUDREY LEE GREEN BE ORDERED FROM ARROWHEAD REGIONAL MEDICAL; CENTER, BEHAVIORAL HEALTH. THE COURT SIGNS THE ORDER RE: PRODUCTION OF PSYCHIATRIC MEDICAL; RECORDS WHICH IS MAILED TO ARROWHEAD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER BY THE JUDICIAL ASSISTANT.; RECORDS ARE ORDERED TO BE DELIVERED TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT WITHIN 10 DAYS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/06/12 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • FILE RETAINED IN DEPARTMENT S31 FOR HEARING ON PETITION 2/9/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • UPDATE FIRM ADDRESS OF DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY, ATTORNEY FOR THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF OF FIREARM PROHIBITION PURSUANT TO W&I 8103; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; WILFRED J. SCHNEIDER, JUDGE; CLERK: KATHLEEN SAENZ; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; IT WAS DISCOVERED THAT THE NOTICE OF TODAYS HEARING WAS SENT TO THE WRONG ADDRESS FOR; RESPONDENT, AUDREY LEE GREEN, AND WAS NOT SENT TO THE ATTENTION OF CLARK HANSEN AT THE D.A.S; OFFICE. THEREFORE, THE COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/09/12 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • FILE SENT TO CP31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • MENTAL HEALTH CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Justice is a litigant