This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:57:24 (UTC).

IN RE: ALFREDO MARES

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 IN RE ALFREDO MARES was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3221

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ADVENTURA, LLC

Interested Party

ALFREDO MARES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EASON & TAMBORNINI

1234 H Street Suite 200

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING/PETITION WITH EXHIBITS BY FED EX ON 07/18/17 AS TO SEE ATTACHED LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING/PETITION WITH EXHIBITS BY FED EX ON 07/18/17 AS TO SEE ATTACHED LIST, FILED.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PET FOR STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PET FOR STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS FILED.

ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS FILED

ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2017
  • HEARING RE: VERIFICATION OF PAYMENT/TRANSFER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/29/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DECLARATION OF MATTHEW R EASON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRAN FILED BY ADVENTURA, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ERIN SCHARG APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ADVENTURA, LLC.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR ADVENTURA, LLC.; TRANSFEROR ALFREDO MARES PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TRANSFEROR CONFIRMS WITH THE COURT HIS DESIRE TO TRANSFER PAYMENT RIGHTS TO TRANSFEREE.; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; COURT FINDS ALLEGATIONS IN PETITION SUFFICIENT AND TRUE.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/11/2017 OF ADVENTURA, LLC IS GRANTED; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: VERIFICATION OF PAYMENT/TRANSFER SET FOR 09/29/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; COUNSEL IS TO PROVIDE THE COURT WITH A DECLARATION AND A COPY OF THE SETTLEMENT DRAFT.; IF PAYMENT HAS NOT BEEN MADE, COUNSEL MAY APPEAR TO ADVISE THE COURT OF ITS STATUS. FAILURE TO; APPEAR AND PROVIDE PROOF OF PAYMENT/TRANSFER MAY RESULT IN AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING; SANCTION FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND/OR FAILURE TO FILE THE NECESSARY DOCUMENTS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING/PETITION WITH EXHIBITS BY FED EX ON 07/18/17 AS TO SEE ATTACHED LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ADVENTURA, LLC FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0648 $435.00; 170712-0648-CK Reference Number 2507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PET FOR STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S25

    Read MoreRead Less