This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 03/26/2019 at 20:26:04 (UTC).

IN RE: ALFREDO MARES

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 IN RE ALFREDO MARES was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9408

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ADVENTURA LLC

Claimant

ALFREDO MARES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EASON & TAMBORNINI

1234 H Street Suite 200

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF HRG, PETITION WITH EXHIBITS FILED AS TO ALFREDO MARES. PARTY SERVED ON 10/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS UNITED STATES PARCEL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF HRG, PETITION WITH EXHIBITS FILED AS TO ALFREDO MARES. PARTY SERVED ON 10/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS UNITED STATES PARCEL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

NTC OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON PET FOR APPRVL OF TRNSFR OF STRCRD STTLMNT PYMNT RGHTS FILED.

NTC OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON PET FOR APPRVL OF TRNSFR OF STRCRD STTLMNT PYMNT RGHTS FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ORDER APPROVAL OF TRANSFER STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS FILED

ORDER APPROVAL OF TRANSFER STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON STURCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON STURCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NTC OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON PET FOR APPRVL OF TRNSFR OF STRCRD STTLMNT PYMNT RGHTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPROVAL OF TRANSFER STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • HEARING RE: STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER MARY ANDERSON 10319; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; DEFENDANT ALFREDO MARES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS.; MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ADVENTURA LLC IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF HRG, PETITION WITH EXHIBITS FILED AS TO ALFREDO MARES. PARTY SERVED ON 10/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS UNITED STATES PARCEL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ADVENTURA LLC FOR STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT HRG; Minutes; Receipt: 171011-0850 $60.00; 171011-0850-CK Reference Number CK#2952

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ADVENTURA LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171011-0846 $435.00; 171011-0846-CK Reference Number CK#2951

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON STURCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PARTY ALFREDO MARES UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less