This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 12:21:44 (UTC).

IN RE 536 PEARL STREET UPLAND CA 91786

Case Summary

On 09/23/2016 IN RE 536 PEARL STREET UPLAND CA 91786 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5846

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

Claimants

RYEL KEN CASTILLO

ARROW LAW GROUP

THE PEARL ST TRUSTU.D.T .

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBANDEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TIFFANY & BOSCO

1230 Columbia St. Suite 680

San Diego, CA 92101

Claimant Attorney

ROBERT B. KATZ & ASSOCIATES

30101 Agoura Court Suite 240

Agoura, CA 91301

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS FILED

ORDER GRANTING DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS FILED.

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION ON DELINQUENT FEE WAIVER FILED

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION ON DELINQUENT FEE WAIVER FILED; Minutes; SET ASIDE ANSWER ON THE PETITION FOR UNRESOLVED CLAIMS FILED 09/23/2016 OF NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION FOR DEFENDANT RYEL KEN CASTILLO

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM TO SURPLUS PROCEEDS AS TO RYEL KEN CASTILLO FILED.

AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM TO SURPLUS PROCEEDS AS TO RYEL KEN CASTILLO FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY RYEL KEN CASTILLO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ROBERT B. KATZ & ASSOCIATES.

ANSWER FILED BY RYEL KEN CASTILLO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ROBERT B. KATZ & ASSOCIATES.

ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO DEPOSIT UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEES SALE FILED

ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO DEPOSIT UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEES SALE FILED

NOTICE TO CLAIMANT RE: SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CCP2924J

NOTICE TO CLAIMANT RE: SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CCP2924J

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION OF TRUSTEE FILED BY NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION.

NOTICE OF PETITION OF TRUSTEE FILED BY NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION.

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2017
  • RELEASED $55,866.71 PER ORDER FUND VXY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS FILED BY RYEL KEN CASTILLO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE:RECEIPT OF ORDER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/08/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • RELEASE OF FUNDS SENT TO COURT FINANCIAL SERVICES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • HEARING RE: SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CCP2924J; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; WILLIAM MCDONALD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY CHERYL HOUDE FOR RYEL KEN CASTILLO.; PROCEEDINGS:; HEARING ON: SURPLUS FUNDS; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; COURT FINDS THAT ONLY ONE CLAIM HAS BEEN SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR RYEL KEN CASTILLO.; COURT ORDERS THE AMOUNT OF $55,837.93 DEPOSITED WITH THE COURT ON OCTOBER 18, 2016 PLUS INTEREST; EARNED FROM THE DATE OF THE DEPOSIT RELEASED TO RYEL KEN CASTILLO.; RYEL KEN CASTILLO TO SUBMIT AN ORDER TO THE COURT; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: OSC RE:RECEIPT OF ORDER SET FOR 03/08/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29.; RYEL KEN CASTILLO TO GIVE NOTICE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE RECEIVED BACK FROM SECRETARY OF HOUSING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DEFENDANT ARROW LAW GROUP FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF HEARING RECEIVED BACK FROM SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO DEPOSIT UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEES SALE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • PLAINTIFF NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160926-0034 $435.00; 160926-0034-CK Reference Number 2032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO CLAIMANT RE: SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CCP2924J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION OF TRUSTEE FILED BY NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.