This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/04/2018 at 21:00:39 (UTC).

IDENMITY COMPANY -V- GANDIR GROUP

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 IDENMITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GANDIR GROUP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9861

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA,

DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

IRENE G RODRIGUEZ

COYOTE MOON, L.P.,

IRENE G RODRIGUEZ,

GANDIR GROUP, L.P.,

GR/JR CONSTRUCTION,

GILBERT RODRIGUEZ JR.

GILBERT B RODRIGUEZ,

YOULITA AND KIRYAKOS LLC

Cross Plaintiff

COYOTE MOON LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF HAUSMAN & SOSA,LLP

20750 Ventura Bl Ste 105

Woodland Hills, CA 913646646

HAUSMAN & SOSA, LLP.

20750 Ventura Blvd., Ste. 105

Woodland Hills, CA 91364-6646

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CHET M POTTER

ABDULAZIZ, GROSSBART, & RUDMAN

6454 Coldwater Canyon Ave

North Hollywood, CA 91615

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 05/22/2017 OF IDEMNITY COMPANY OFCALIFORNIA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • VACATE MANSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/18 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S16J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER (07/25/18) FILED BY DEFENDANT COYOTE MOON, L.P.,; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF CASE RE ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM IRENE G RODRIGUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF CASE RE ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM GILBERT B RODRIGUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • HEARING RE-ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • HEARING RE-ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO GR/JR CONSTRUCTION, WITH COSTS OF $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO IRENE G RODRIGUEZ WITH COSTS OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COYOTE MOON, L.P.,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY IDEMNITY COMPANY OFCALIFORNIA,, DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITYCOMPANY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170525-0561 $380.00; 170525-0561-CK Reference Number 4295

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less