Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 23:15:04 (UTC).

ICON OWNER POOL -v- HOME FASHION

Case Summary

On 05/04/2017 ICON OWNER POOL filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against HOME FASHION. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3008

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ICON OWNER POOL 1 INLAND EMPIRE

Defendant

HOME FASHION EXPO,INC

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD L. SEIDE

901 Dove St., Suite 120

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MALAFOURIS

3175-E Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/10/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/10/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON HOME FASHION EXPO,INC; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/10/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON HOME FASHION EXPO,INC; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/10/17

ANSWER FILED BY HOME FASHION EXPO,INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MALAFOURIS.

ANSWER FILED BY HOME FASHION EXPO,INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MALAFOURIS.; Minutes; Receipt: 170516-0485 $435.00; 170516-0485-VS Reference Number 031-0015400104

ANSWER FILED BY HOME FASHION EXPO,INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MALAFOURIS.

ANSWER FILED BY HOME FASHION EXPO,INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MALAFOURIS.; Minutes; Receipt: 170516-0485 $435.00; 170516-0485-VS Reference Number 031-0015400104

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170504-0428 $435.00; 170504-0428-VS Reference Number 06921D

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/10/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON HOME FASHION EXPO,INC; PARTY SERVED ON 05/10/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED 05/04/2017 OF ICON OWNER POOL 1 INLAND EMPIRE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HOME FASHION EXPO,INC FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 170516-0490 $7.00; 170516-0490-VS Reference Number 031-0015400104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY HOME FASHION EXPO,INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MALAFOURIS.; Minutes; Receipt: 170516-0485 $435.00; 170516-0485-VS Reference Number 031-0015400104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • ANSWER RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • EX PARTE COMMUNICATION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE COURT DOES NOT ACCEPT EX PARTE COMMUNICATION TO THE JUDGE W/ SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • EXPARTE LETTER RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $15,182.87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $300.34.--BEGINNING ON 05/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170504-0428 $435.00; 170504-0428-VS Reference Number 06921D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seide, Richard L