This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:07:20 (UTC).

HUNTER-SOUTHERN-V-ARGOSY UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 HUNTER-SOUTHERN-V-ARGOSY UNIVERSITY was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1382

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHERISSE HUNTER-SOUTHERN

Defendant

ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GORDON REES SCULLYMANSUKHANI,LLP

101 W Broadway Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

EDUCATION MGMT. CORP.

210 Sixth Avenue 3Rd Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF LAURA RYAN FILED

DECLARATION OF LAURA RYAN FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHERISSE HUNTER-SOUTHERN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHERISSE HUNTER-SOUTHERN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER FILED BY ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE.

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER FILED BY ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE.

DECLARATION OF GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET & CONFER

DECLARATION OF GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET & CONFER

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING GORDON REES SCULLYMANSUKHANI,LLP WITH EDUCATION MGMT. CORP. AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING GORDON REES SCULLYMANSUKHANI,LLP WITH EDUCATION MGMT. CORP. AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DEMURRER FILED BY ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE; REPRESENTED BY GORDON REES SCULLYMANSUKHANI,LLP(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE; REPRESENTED BY GORDON REES SCULLYMANSUKHANI,LLP(IMAGED)

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHERISSE HUNTER-SOUTHERN

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHERISSE HUNTER-SOUTHERN

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CHERISSE HUNTER-SOUTHERN FOR COPY OF ENTIRE FILE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT L BRUCK; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CHERISSE HUNTER-SOUTHERN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS MORE TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE SET FOR 12/12/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST INCLUDE ORIGINAL SIGNATURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE. PARTY SERVED ON 08/11/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS OUTSIDE CALIFORNIA. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE WITH COSTS OF $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ARGOSY UNIVERSITY INLANDEMPIRE WITH COSTS OF $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CHERISSE HUNTER-SOUTHERN FOR COPIES OF AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THE AMOUNT OF $59.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • PROOF OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE OF CIVIL SUBPOENA AS TO MEGAN CASTILLO FEE 0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CHERISSE HUNTER-SOUTHERN FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CHERISSE HUNTER-SOUTHERN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CHERISSE HUNTER-SOUTHERN IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less