This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:49:46 (UTC).

HUNT-V- MCDONALD ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 HUNT-V- MCDONALD was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0002

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellants

DELVON MCDONALD

BREANNE CAPECI

Respondent

HUNT ENTERPRISES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

ALBERT ROBLES

1501 India Street, Ste 103 Pmb4

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 08/05/16.

REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 08/05/16.

ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PER 8.882 (C )(1) FILED

ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PER 8.882 (C )(1) FILED

LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

AFFIDAVIT OF DEPUTY CLERK REGARDING RECORD ON APPEAL- FILED.

AFFIDAVIT OF DEPUTY CLERK REGARDING RECORD ON APPEAL- FILED.

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 1 VOL RT

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 1 VOL RT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2016
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • APPEAL COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • APPEAL FILED 02/08/2016 OF DELVON MCDONALD COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 08/05/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PER 8.882 (C )(1) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • LATE LETTER SENT: REGARDING APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 07/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 07/07/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DEPUTY CLERK REGARDING RECORD ON APPEAL- FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 1 VOL RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #UDFS1508972-FONTANA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.