This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 15:24:09 (UTC).

HUILING WANG -N- TONY PENG

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 HUILING WANG -N- TONY PENG was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0923

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HUILING WANG

Respondent

TONY PENG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TONNIE CHENG

1216 S. Garfield Ave., Ste 102

Alhambra, CA 91801

Respondent Attorney

RIOS, DELILAH KNOX

17890 Castleton St Ste 101

City Of Industry, CA 91748

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2017
  • RSP TO DISSO/UCCJEA/POS PLACED IN FILE BACK BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RSP TO DISSO/UCCJEA BY MAIL ON 05/09/17 AS TO TONNIE CHENG, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF HUILING WANG BY TONY PENG FILED. REPRESENTED BY DELILAH KNOX RIOS.; Minutes; Receipt: 170511-0430 $435.00; 170511-0430-CK Reference Number 1668

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION, SUMMONS, UCCJEA BY MAIL ON 04/06/17 AS TO TONY PENG, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TONY PENG; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $90.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY HUILING WANG FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0402 $435.00; 170206-0402-CK Reference Number 138

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.