This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 11:41:49 (UTC).

HUGHES -V- THE FLESH CLUB

Case Summary

On 08/22/2012 HUGHES filed an Other lawsuit against THE FLESH CLUB. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pacheco, John M, Hanscom, Richard and King, Pamela Preston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8800

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pacheco, John M

Hanscom, Richard

King, Pamela Preston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUGHES, RICHARD MICHAEL

Defendants

CMGH LLC

MANTA MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

WALDON R WELTY INC

WELTY, WALDON RANDALL

Not Yet Classified

MANTA MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA

THE FLESH CLUB A CALIFORNIA BUSINESS ENTITY

THE FLESH CLUB, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE FLESH CLUB

Not Classified By Court

W R WELTY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOWARTH & SMITH

MARSH, RICKARD & BRYAN PC

Defendant Attorneys

KRONENBERG LAW, PC

PHILLIPS,SPALLAS &ANGSTADT LLP

ATKINSON & WATKINS

DIAMOND, ROGER JON

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED ON 07-01-

07/01/2015: ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED ON 07-01-

NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS MAILED TO PARTIE

04/24/2015: NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS MAILED TO PARTIE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ST

01/13/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ST

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED B

01/05/2015: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED B

MOTION RE- TAX COSTS SET FOR HEARING ON 02-13-15,

12/24/2014: MOTION RE- TAX COSTS SET FOR HEARING ON 02-13-15,

EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

12/12/2014: EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY WALDON RANDALL WELTY, RODNE

12/08/2014: MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY WALDON RANDALL WELTY, RODNE

ORDER JUDGMENT FILED

12/03/2014: ORDER JUDGMENT FILED

SPECIAL VERDICT FILED.

11/12/2014: SPECIAL VERDICT FILED.

JURY QUESTION #1 FILED.

11/12/2014: JURY QUESTION #1 FILED.

INSTRUCTIONS TO THE JURY - GIVEN - FILED.

11/12/2014: INSTRUCTIONS TO THE JURY - GIVEN - FILED.

INSTRUCTIONS TO THE JURY - GIVEN - FILED.

11/12/2014: INSTRUCTIONS TO THE JURY - GIVEN - FILED.

PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN SPPRT OF RETAINING RANDALL WEL

11/10/2014: PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN SPPRT OF RETAINING RANDALL WEL

STIPULATION RE- JURY INSTRUCTIONS-VERDICT-STY OF E

10/27/2014: STIPULATION RE- JURY INSTRUCTIONS-VERDICT-STY OF E

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO RODNEY PATTERSON, JOSHUA STE

10/24/2014: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO RODNEY PATTERSON, JOSHUA STE

DFT'S PROPOSED JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE FILED.

10/24/2014: DFT'S PROPOSED JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE FILED.

DFT'S PROPOSED JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE FILED.

10/24/2014: DFT'S PROPOSED JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE- DFT'S RE CONDITIONS OF CONDIT

10/23/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE RE- DFT'S RE CONDITIONS OF CONDIT

225 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketExhibits Destroyed Pursuant to Court Order; Comment: EXHIBITS DESTROYED ON 07/02/15 PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER FILED 07/01/15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Destruction of Exhibits Signed; Comment: ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED ON 07/01/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Destruction of Exhibits Mailed to Parties; Comment: NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS MAILED TO PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketComment:; Comment: $2947.32 JURY FEES EXPENSED TO THE COURT FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: MOTION RE: TAX COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF RICHARD MICHAEL HUGHES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • DocketMotion Re:; Original Type: Motion Re:; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: MOTION RE: TAX COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF RICHARD MICHAEL HUGHES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • DocketComment:; Comment: $5048.00 COURT REPORTER FEES EXPENSED TO THE COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • DocketJury Fees Posted; Comment: JURY FEES POSTED BY PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF $23.84 150123-1900-CK JTF/ 23.84 PAYMT 150123-1900-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 32017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:STATUS OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
663 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:; Comment: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO WALDON RANDALL WELTY SERVED ON 08/29/12 WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • DocketUpdate Party Address; Comment: PARTY WALDON RANDALL WELTY UPDATED: NAME OF DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20120822-2393; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $9,485.83; Total Payments and Credits: $9,485.83

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketAttorney Added for Plaintiff; Comment: ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RICHARD MICHAEL HUGHES FOR RICHARD MICHAEL HUGHES, ATTORNEY MARSH, RICKARD & BRYAN PC ADDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 120822-2393-CK CVR/ 435.00 PAYMT 120822-2393-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 29632

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less