This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 01:04:19 (UTC).

HUGHES -V- STANISLAUS

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 HUGHES filed an Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property lawsuit against STANISLAUS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ochoa, Gilbert, Garza, Donna Gunnell and Poncin, Lynn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2304

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ochoa, Gilbert

Garza, Donna Gunnell

Poncin, Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUGHES, MICHAEL JAY

Defendant

STANISLAUS, SELVI CECELIA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

04/23/2019: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

04/23/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

04/23/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

04/23/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

04/23/2019: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

04/23/2019: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

05/20/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

05/20/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

08/05/2020

DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Comment; Comment: (COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2020

DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (FAILURE TO SERVE) GILBERT OCHOA,JUDGE CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA COURT REPORTER CARRIE LANE;8882 COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD 09:08 COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 08/05/20 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2020

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2020

DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (FAILURE TO SERVE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2020

DocketHearing Re:; Original Type: Hearing Re:; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2020

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2020

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (FAILURE TO SERVE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2020

DocketHearing Re:; Original Type: Hearing Re:; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2020

DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (FAILURE TO SERVE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2020

DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
04/23/2019

DocketFiling Fee Waived for; Comment: FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHAEL JAY HUGHES FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2019

DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL JAY HUGHES IS GRANTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed; Comment: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2019

DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL JAY HUGHES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2019

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2019
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less