This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 04:04:35 (UTC).

HUGHES -V- HARRIS

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 HUGHES filed an Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property lawsuit against HARRIS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Davis, Keith D and Alvarez, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3220

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Davis, Keith D

Alvarez, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUGHES, MICHAEL JAY

Defendant

HARRIS, KAMALA DEVI

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

04/30/2019: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

04/30/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

04/30/2019: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

04/30/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

04/30/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

04/30/2019: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

06/27/2019: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

12/16/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

01/17/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND NOTICE BY MAIL ON

02/14/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND NOTICE BY MAIL ON

 

Docket Entries

02/27/2020

DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Davis, Keith D; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Comment; Comment: (COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY MICHAEL JAY HUGHES.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2020

DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Davis, Keith D; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL KEITH D DAVIS,JUDGE CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI;13302 COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER CALLED AT: 09:26 THE COURT NOTES THE MINUTE ORDER DATED 12/16/19. COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY MICHAEL JAY HUGHES. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 2/27/20 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2020

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Original Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Davis, Keith D; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020

DocketService type not specified; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 02/14/2020; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND NOTICE BY MAIL ON 01/31/20 AS TO KAMALA DEVI HARRIS, FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND NOTICE BY MAIL ON 01/31/20 AS TO KAMALA DEVI HARRIS, FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Original Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2020

DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE OSCDM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/14/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2020

DocketOn Court's Motion, Hearing Previously Set is Ordered Reset; Comment: ON COURT'S MOTION, THE 2/14/20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING PRESENTLY SET IN THIS CASE, IS ORDERED RESET FOR 02/27/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25. NOTICE SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
04/30/2019

DocketFiling Fee Waived for; Comment: FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHAEL JAY HUGHES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019

DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL JAY HUGHES IS GRA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed; Comment: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019

DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL JAY HUGHES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less