This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/18/2021 at 11:00:51 (UTC).

HUERTA -V- PRIME HEALTHCARE MGMT, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 HUERTA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PRIME HEALTHCARE MGMT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pacheco, John M and Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6468

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classifieds

Pacheco, John M

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DESIREE HUERTA

Defendants

PRIME HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, INC

ELENI GAVRILOGLOU

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LYON LAW

400 Oceangate Suite 450

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

06/22/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RE REFERRING ACTION TO

06/19/2015: ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RE REFERRING ACTION TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

06/18/2015: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

05/29/2015: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

05/07/2015: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

05/07/2015: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150507-085

05/07/2015: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150507-085

NOTICE IMAGED

05/07/2015: NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL DUE TO SETTLEMENT/BINDING ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL DUE TO SETTLEMENT/BINDING ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/15/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD/TSC WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR.,JUDGE CLERK: KIM ALLAIN COURT REPORTER RACHEL PARRA;13566 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFF. KIARA GEBHART APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PRIME HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, INC. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ELENI GAVRILOGLOU - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COUNSEL INFORM THE COURT THAT THIS CASE HAS SETTLED. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL DUE TO SETTLEMENT/BINDING ARBITRATION SET FOR 07/15/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD/TSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketComment:; Comment: FILE SENT TO S32 FOR 06/01 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR.,JUDGE CLERK: KIM ALLAIN COURT REPORTER JULIE QUINTANILLA;11309 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFF. SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY KIARA GEBHART FOR PRIME HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT VIA COURT CALL. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL. REASON: PARTIES HAVE STIPULATED TO ARBITRATION - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD/TSC SET FOR 06/01/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Original Type: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20150507-0853; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $1,307.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,307.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150507-0853-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketFee Payment; Comment: FEE PAYMENT 150507-0859-CK FCP/ 2.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant