This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:05:33 (UTC).

HOWIE -V- CAMPAGNA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 HOWIE -V- CAMPAGNA was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7786

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Minor

TOMMIE CHERIE HOWIE

Defendants

REYNA COMPAGNA

UNIVERSE AT ACACIA(DE), LLC, A DELAWARE

NICHOLAS RIGGS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF LARRY H. PARKER, INC.

350 San Antonio Drive

Long Beach, CA 90807

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON UNIVERSE AT ACACIA(DE), LLC, ADELAWARE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON UNIVERSE AT ACACIA(DE), LLC, ADELAWARE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR TOMMIE CHERIE HOWIE IS FANCIE RENEE BRAVO -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY GILBERT OCHOA.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR TOMMIE CHERIE HOWIE IS FANCIE RENEE BRAVO -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY GILBERT OCHOA.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP ON NICHOLAS RIGGS SERVED ON 10/14/17 COSTS $56.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP ON REYNA COMPAGNA SERVED 10/14/17 COSTS $57.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON UNIVERSE AT ACACIA(DE), LLC, ADELAWARE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR TOMMIE CHERIE HOWIE IS FANCIE RENEE BRAVO -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY GILBERT OCHOA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TOMMIE CHERIE HOWIE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0557 $435.00; 170914-0557-CK Reference Number CK 329163

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TOMMIE CHERIE HOWIE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less