Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 06/27/2018 at 19:03:51 (UTC).

HOWARD -V- WINTERS JR.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2018 HOWARD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WINTERS JR. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0119

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRACE HOWARD

Defendant

MATTHEW LEE WINTERS JR

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT WINDOW)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT WINDOW)

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 04/17/2018 OF GRACE HOWARD ORDERED ENTERED 06/07/18; JUDGMENT FOR: GRACE HOWARD; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MATTHEW LEE WINTERS JR; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MATTHEW LEE WINTERS JR. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION OF OF MAILING OF CERTIFIED MAILING FILED

DECLARATION OF OF MAILING OF CERTIFIED MAILING FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MATTHEW LEE WINTERS JR FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MATTHEW LEE WINTERS JR FILED.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT WINDOW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 04/17/2018 OF GRACE HOWARD ORDERED ENTERED 06/07/18; JUDGMENT FOR: GRACE HOWARD; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MATTHEW LEE WINTERS JR; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MATTHEW LEE WINTERS JR. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF OF MAILING OF CERTIFIED MAILING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MATTHEW LEE WINTERS JR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/17/2018 OF GRACE HOWARD AS TO MATTHEW LEE WINTERS JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON MATTHEW LEE WINTERS JR; POSTED ON 04/24/18 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON GRACE HOWARD FOR 1ST PAPER FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GRACE HOWARD IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • ADA LETTER MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY GRACE HOWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less