This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 23:07:46 (UTC).

HOUSTON -V- 99CENT ONLY STORES

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 HOUSTON filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against 99CENT ONLY STORES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5825

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRVIN HOUSTON

Defendant

99 CENT ONLY STORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

YORK & WAINFELD LLP

9301 Oakdale Avenue Suite 220

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2012
  • ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY 99 CENT ONLY STORES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • MOTION RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT 99 CENT ONLY STORES; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: IRVIN HOUSTON; ATTORNEY KATHERINE DOMENICO PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; MOTION; 99 CENT ONLY STORES'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY/AMEND IS HEARD.; SUBMITTED ON POINTS & AUTHORITIES; NO OPPOSITION FILED AND/OR SUBMITTED; COURT FINDS:; 99 CENT ONLY STORES'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY/AMEND IS GRANTED.; (FINDINGS ON THE RECORD); DEFENDANT TO PREPARE NOTICE & ORDER.; ON THE COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PLA FAILURE TO AMEND COMPLAINT PER COURT ORDER.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • FILE TO S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • FILE SENT TO LR32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO STRIKE AND CMC FILED BY 99 CENT ONLY STORES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • MOTION RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT 99 CENT ONLY STORES; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; IRVIN HOUSTON, PLAINTIFF PRESENT IN PRO PER.; ATTORNEY KATHERINE DOMENICO PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; MOTION; 99 CENT ONLY STORES'S MOTION TO RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDE IS HEARD.; NO OPPOSITION FILED.; ARGUED AND SUBMITTED BY THE PARTIES.; COURT FINDS:; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: REQUEST TIME TO OBTAIN COUNSEL; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/09/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 11/09/11 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; IRVIN HOUSTON, PLAINTIFF PRESENT IN PRO PER.; ATTORNEY KATHERINE DOMENICO PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; THE COURT NOTES PLAINTIFFS APPEARANCE FOR TODAYS PROCEEDINGS AND ADVISES PLAINTIFF THAT; IF THE COMPLAINT HAS NOT BEEN AMENDED AND/OR AN OPPOSITION FILED WITH THE COURT, THE COURT; SHALL ORDER THIS MATTER DISMISSED AT THE NEXT HEARING.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/09/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 11/09/11 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2011
  • ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF IRVIN HOUSTON, 99 CENT ONLY STORES IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT/PETITION IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF IRVIN HOUSTON - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY IRVIN HOUSTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY IRVIN HOUSTON IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON IRVIN HOUSTON FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less