This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 05:55:32 (UTC).

HOU VS BURKE

Case Summary

On 01/24/2011 HOU filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BURKE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0045

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSIN JEN HOU

Defendants

PATRICK M. BURKE

MICHAEL P. CARPENTER

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AY, LAW OFFICES OF TOM C. TS

208 E. Valley Blvd. #C

San Gabriel, CA 91776

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SENT TO ATTY VIA SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 110216-0478 $25.00; 110216-0478-CK Reference Number 1491

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PATRICK M. BURKE, MICHAEL P. CARPENTER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/24/2011 OF HSIN HOU AS TO PATRICK M. BURKE, MICHAEL P. CARPENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 01/24/2011 OF HSIN HOU ORDERED ENTERED 02/16/11; JUDGMENT FOR: HSIN JEN HOU; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PATRICK M. BURKE, MICHAEL P. CARPENTER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: PATRICK M. BURKE, MICHAEL P. CARPENTER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/24/2011 OF HSIN HOU AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; PARTY SERVED ON 01/31/11 (UD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/24/2011 OF HSIN HOU, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MICHAEL P. CARPENTER; PARTY SERVED ON 01/31/11 (UD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON PATRICK M. BURKE; PARTY SERVED ON 01/31/11 (UD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110125-0133 $255.00; 110125-0133-CK Reference Number 1483

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less