This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 09:26:30 (UTC).

HOSSAIN -V- GREEN OASIS

Case Summary

On 05/07/2013 HOSSAIN filed an Other lawsuit against GREEN OASIS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0024

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

GREEN OASIS COLLECTIVE

Respondent

MOHAMMAD HOSSAIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

JAMES DEAGUILERA

2068 Orange Tree Lane Suite 218

Redlands, CA 92374

Respondent Attorney

BRITTAIN, GREGORY W

1233 Brookside Avenue Suite A

Redlands, CA 92373

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2013
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • APPEAL COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • APPEAL FILED 05/07/2013 OF GREEN OASIS COLLECTIVE COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 06/21/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • APPEAL DISMISSED -- BEFORE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • NO DESIGNATIONS RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF SUPERSEDEAS AND IMMEDIATE STAY OF EVICTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • PETITION FOR WRIT FAXED TO RANCHO-LEGAL RESEARCH FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • DECLARATION OF JAMES DEAGUILERA IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT AND REQUEST FOR STAY FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR WRIT AND DECLARATION BY MAIL ON 05/07/13 AS TO RESPONDENT ATTORNEY, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • PETITION FOR WRIT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE UDDS 1301137 - SAN BERNARDINO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRITTAIN, GREGORY W