This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 14:13:30 (UTC).

HORRIGAN-V-BIG BEAR

Case Summary

On 10/19/2018 HORRIGAN-V-BIG BEAR was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7180

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG

GENIE NICOLE HORRIGAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

CITY OF BIG BEAR LAKE

BIG BEAR FIRE DEPARTMENT

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPARTMENT

BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC

SNAKE RIVER STABLES, INC

BIG BEAR FIRE AUTHORITY

Defendant and Cross Defendant

SNAKE RIVER STABLES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCNICHOLAS & MCNICHOLAS LLP

10866 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GROSSBERG & HOEHN

1026 W Foothill Boulevard

Upland, CA 91786

CLINTON & CLINTON

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SNAKE RIVER STABLES, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/24/19 WITH COSTS OF $205.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SNAKE RIVER STABLES, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/24/19 WITH COSTS OF $205.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GENIE NICOLE HORRIGAN, JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GENIE NICOLE HORRIGAN, JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG.

DECLARATION OF KENT RE: CMC HEARING 06/01/19 FILED

DECLARATION OF KENT RE: CMC HEARING 06/01/19 FILED

NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, OSC FILED BY BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, OSC FILED BY BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CMC FILED BY GENIE NICOLE HORRIGAN, JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CMC FILED BY GENIE NICOLE HORRIGAN, JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/19/2018 OF GENIE HORRIGAN BY BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/19/2018 OF GENIE HORRIGAN BY BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC

NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR FILED BY CITY OF BIG BEAR LAKE.

NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR FILED BY CITY OF BIG BEAR LAKE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPARTMENT, CITY OF BIG BEAR LAKE, BIG BEAR FIRE AUTHORITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPARTMENT, CITY OF BIG BEAR LAKE, BIG BEAR FIRE AUTHORITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO THE DEMURRER FILED BY CITY OF BIG BEAR LAKE, BIG BEAR FIRE AUTHORITY.

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO THE DEMURRER FILED BY CITY OF BIG BEAR LAKE, BIG BEAR FIRE AUTHORITY.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SNAKE RIVER STABLES, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/19 WITH COSTS OF $230.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SNAKE RIVER STABLES, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/19 WITH COSTS OF $230.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC SERVED ON 01/19/19 WITH FEES OF $292.90.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC SERVED ON 01/19/19 WITH FEES OF $292.90.

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER R YOUNG RE MEET AND CONFER FILED

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER R YOUNG RE MEET AND CONFER FILED

DEMURRER FILED BY CITY OF BIG BEAR LAKE, BIG BEAR FIRE AUTHORITY; REPRESENTED BY GROSSBERG & HOEHN(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY CITY OF BIG BEAR LAKE, BIG BEAR FIRE AUTHORITY; REPRESENTED BY GROSSBERG & HOEHN(IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BIG BEAR FIRE DEPARTMENT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/11/18 WITH COSTS OF $149.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BIG BEAR FIRE DEPARTMENT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/11/18 WITH COSTS OF $149.95 FILED.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG IS TAMI BRINSON -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY BRYAN F FOSTER.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG IS TAMI BRINSON -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY BRYAN F FOSTER.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SNAKE RIVER STABLES, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/24/19 WITH COSTS OF $205.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR GENIE NICOLE HORRIGAN, JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG.; Minutes; Receipt: 190708-0504 $150.00; 190708-0504-CK Reference Number 86405

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GENIE NICOLE HORRIGAN, JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS(PLTF FTA)/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: AMIE ARROYO; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL KENT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GENIE NICOLE HORRIGAN, JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG.; ATTORNEY MARLON DOYEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TRIAL REQUESTED.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 7 DAY(S).; JURY DEMANDED BY COUNSEL.; JURY FEES ARE TO BE POSTED AT LEAST 10 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE; DEEMED A WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 04/23/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/27/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 7 DAYS.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF KENT RE: CMC HEARING 06/01/19 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, OSC FILED BY BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: PATRICIA GUERRERO; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT C. BELLAMY; APPEARANCES:; MCNICHOLAS & MCNICHOLAS LLP FOR GENIE NICOLE HORRIGAN NOT PRESENT; ATTORNEY HATHANH NGUYEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BIG BEAR LAKE CONVENTION CENTER, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; 08:31; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR:; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS(PLTF FTA)/TSC SET FOR 07/01/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENSE TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CMC FILED BY GENIE NICOLE HORRIGAN, JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPARTMENT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/13/18 WITH COSTS OF $56.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF BIG BEAR LAKE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/11/18 WITH COSTS OF $149.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/13/18 WITH COSTS OF $76.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG IS TAMI BRINSON -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY BRYAN F FOSTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/19/2018 OF GENIE HORRIGAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • PLAINTIFF GENIE NICOLE HORRIGAN, JADA CRAMER-HARTWIG FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 181019-0718 $435.00; 181019-0718-CK Reference Number 3651596

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.