Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:47:56 (UTC).

HOMECOMING VS ZHANG

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 HOMECOMING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ZHANG. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4846

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOMECOMING I AT THE PRESERVE, LLC

Defendant

WENJUAN ZHANG

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHTON, HELAINE S

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF HOMECOMING I AT THEPRESERVE, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: HOMECOMING I AT THEPRESERVE, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WENJUAN ZHANG; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,622.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $535.00 AND DAMAGES $2,447.20.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,104.20; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF HOMECOMING I AT THEPRESERVE, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: HOMECOMING I AT THEPRESERVE, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WENJUAN ZHANG; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,622.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $535.00 AND DAMAGES $2,447.20.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,104.20; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFF BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFF BIN)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF HOMECOMING I AT THEPRESERVE, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 07/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: HOMECOMING I AT THEPRESERVE, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WENJUAN ZHANG, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: WENJUAN ZHANG, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON WENJUAN ZHANG, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON WENJUAN ZHANG, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON WENJUAN ZHANG; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/16/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON WENJUAN ZHANG; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/16/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/16/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/16/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0491 $255.00

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF HOMECOMING I AT THEPRESERVE, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: HOMECOMING I AT THEPRESERVE, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WENJUAN ZHANG; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,622.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $535.00 AND DAMAGES $2,447.20.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,104.20; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 08/28/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $535.00, ATTORNEY FEES $500.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON WENJUAN ZHANG, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON WENJUAN ZHANG; PARTY SERVED ON 07/16/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF HOMECOMING I AT THEPRESERVE, LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/16/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $2,622.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $87.40.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0491 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOMECOMING I AT THE PRESERVE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHTON, HELAINE S