This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 00:33:38 (UTC).

HOMECOMING -VS- COLES

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 HOMECOMING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COLES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3323

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOMECOMING III AT THE PRESERVE, LLC

Defendant

SARAH COLES

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELAINE S. ASHTON

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/17/2017 OF HOMECOMING III AT THE PRESERVE,LLC ORDERED ENTERED 06/13/17; JUDGMENT FOR: HOMECOMING III AT THE PRESERVE,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SARAH COLES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: SARAH COLES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SARAH COLES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SARAH COLES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/26/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/26/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON SARAH COLES; POSTED ON 05/26/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON SARAH COLES; POSTED ON 05/26/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/17/2017 OF HOMECOMING III AT THE PRESERVE,LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: HOMECOMING III AT THE PRESERVE,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SARAH COLES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,093.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $555.00 AND DAMAGES $2,528.06.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,676.06; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DECLARATION OF LOST LEASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $555.00, ATTORNEY FEES $500.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 07/11/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON SARAH COLES; POSTED ON 05/26/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170524-0488 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,093.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $61.66.--BEGINNING ON 06/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170517-0575 $255.00; 170517-0575-CK Reference Number CK

    Read MoreRead Less