This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 02:57:13 (UTC).

HOMECOMING -v- CRUZ et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 HOMECOMING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CRUZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8737

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC

Defendants

ALMA CRUZ

EDDIE WHEELER JR

AMBER WHEELER

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HELAINE S. ASHTON

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

7676 Hazard Center Dr St 900C

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO PLAINTIFFS ATTY IN SSAE ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO PLAINTIFFS ATTY IN SSAE ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0765 $25.00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ALMA CRUZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ALMA CRUZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

NOTICE CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC.

NOTICE CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC.

DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT AND ORDER FILED BY HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC

DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT AND ORDER FILED BY HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR: HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALMA CRUZ, EDDIE WHEELER JR, AMBER WHEELER; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ALMA CRUZ, EDDIE WHEELER JR, AMBER WHEELER. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON EDDIE WHEELER JR; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON EDDIE WHEELER JR; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0533 $255.00; 161214-0533-CK Reference Number 527906

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON AMBER WHEELER; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON AMBER WHEELER; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARD TO SHERIFF)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARD TO SHERIFF)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALMA CRUZ, EDDIE WHEELER JR, AMBER WHEELER.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALMA CRUZ, EDDIE WHEELER JR, AMBER WHEELER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALMA CRUZ, EDDIE WHEELER JR, AMBER WHEELER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,287.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $520.00 AND DAMAGES $1,067.22.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,374.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2017
  • ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC FOR HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC, ATTORNEY KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • REMOVE ATTORNEY HELAINE S. ASHTON FROM CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO PLAINTIFFS ATTY IN SSAE ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0765 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED UNSERVED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 000.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • ** VOID ** FEE FOR WRIT ISSUED AB145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO PLAINTIFFS ATTY IN SSAE ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0648 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $191.74), AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • WRIT/MEMO OF COST RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALMA CRUZ, EDDIE WHEELER JR, AMBER WHEELER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,287.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $520.00 AND DAMAGES $1,067.22.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,374.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF HOMECOMING I AT TERRA VISTA, LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON EDDIE WHEELER JR; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON AMBER WHEELER; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ALMA CRUZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $2,287.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $76.23.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0533 $255.00; 161214-0533-CK Reference Number 527906

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.