Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 10:51:48 (UTC).

HOFFMAN -V- ERGON ASPHALT

Case Summary

On 09/13/2011 HOFFMAN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ERGON ASPHALT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0797

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

LEE HOFFMAN

Defendant and Respondent

ERGON ASPHALT & EMULSIONS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

TIMOTHY L TAGGART

999 N. Pacific Street A Bldg- Box 1

Oceanside, CA 92054

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF BORTON PETRINI, LLP

1461 Ford Street Suite 201

Redlands, CA 92373

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2015
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY ERGON ASPHALT & EMULSIONS, INC, FOR 545.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • REMITTITUR ROUTED TO SAN BERNARDINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • PER CURIAM OPINION RECVD FROM APPEAL - PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • OPINION RECEIVED FROM THE COURT OF APPEALS AND ROUTED TO SAN BERNARDINO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • APPELLATE ORDER MOTION TO GRANT PRIORITY IS GRANTED FILED AND FORWARDED TO COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • APPELLATE ORDER NTC OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED AND FORWARDED TO COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • ORDER RE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE APPEAL RECORDS - DENIED IN PART, GRANTED IN PART FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY ERGON ASPHALT & EMULSIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
150 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY ERGON ASPHALT & EMULSIONS, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BRAGG & KULUVA.; Minutes; Receipt: 111021-3089 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • ANSWER IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110913-1982 $395.00; 110913-1982-VS Reference Number 025-0038544973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM CRD TO CRDL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • SUMMONS ON THE COMPLAINT OF LEE HOFFMAN FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • COMPLAINT/PETITION IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ERGON ASPHALT & EMULSIONS, INC is a litigant