Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 10:01:17 (UTC).

HOCKERT -V- ANABI OIL

Case Summary

On 10/13/2017 HOCKERT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANABI OIL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0084

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIDGET HOCKERT

Defendants

USA GASOLINE

ANABI OIL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MANNY IBAY

10520 Venice Blvd

Culver City, CA 90232

TREYSTMAN LAW

11755 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1250

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

HIGGS, FLETCHER & MACK LLP

401 West A Street Ste 2600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO PLA BRIDGET HOCKERT BY MAIL ON 05/31/18 AS TO MANNY IBAY, ESQ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO PLA BRIDGET HOCKERT FILED BY ANABI OIL CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF OSC RE STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT ALL HEARINGS HAVE BEEN VACATED AND AN OSC RE STATUS OF REMOVAL HAS BEEN; SET ON 11/29/18 AT 8:30 AM IN S33.; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/13/2017 OF BRIDGET HOCKERT FOR ANABI OIL CORPORATION, ATTORNEY HIGGS, FLETCHER & MACK LLP ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED.; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ELEONORA TREYSTMAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BRIDGET HOCKERT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BRIDGET HOCKERT FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/13/2017 OF BRIDGET HOCKERT FOR BRIDGET HOCKERT, ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF MANNY IBAY ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BRIDGET HOCKERT FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171013-0539 $435.00; 171013-0539-CK Reference Number 116101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA GASOLINE is a litigant

Latest cases where ANABI OIL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant