This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 01:17:36 (UTC).

HO -VS- NAVARRO

Case Summary

On 05/19/2017 HO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NAVARRO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3491

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AI K HO

BRUCE KWONG

Defendants

DESIRE NAVARRO

CHRIS NAVARRO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARD M PALMER

229 N Riverside Ave

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON DESIRE NAVARRO; POSTED ON 06/06/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON DESIRE NAVARRO; POSTED ON 06/06/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON CHRIS NAVARRO; POSTED ON 06/06/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON CHRIS NAVARRO; POSTED ON 06/06/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/06/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/06/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DESIRE NAVARRO, CHRIS NAVARRO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DESIRE NAVARRO, CHRIS NAVARRO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/19/2017 OF AI HO ORDERED ENTERED 06/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: AI K HO, BRUCE KWONG; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DESIRE NAVARRO, CHRIS NAVARRO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DESIRE NAVARRO, CHRIS NAVARRO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AI K HO FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 170706-0870 $25.00; 170706-0870-CK Reference Number 80573

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/19/2017 OF AI HO ORDERED ENTERED 06/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: AI K HO, BRUCE KWONG; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DESIRE NAVARRO, CHRIS NAVARRO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DESIRE NAVARRO, CHRIS NAVARRO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DESIRE NAVARRO, CHRIS NAVARRO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/19/2017 OF AI HO AS TO DESIRE NAVARRO, CHRIS NAVARRO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170606-0433 $20.00; 170606-0433-CK Reference Number 80414

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DESIRE NAVARRO FOR ANSWER PACKET/SAMPLE; Minutes; Receipt: 170530-0059 $2.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $3,575.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $10.83.--BEGINNING ON 03/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170522-0007 $255.00; 170522-0007-CK Reference Number CK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD M PALMER