This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 10:47:32 (UTC).

H.L. FOODSERVICE, INC. -V- VAQUERO MEAT ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 H L FOODSERVICE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VAQUERO MEAT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1253

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H.L FOODSERVICE, INC.

Defendants

VAQUERO MEAT, INC., A CALIFORNIA

JUAN BONILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALAN L. BRODKIN & ASSOC.

15500 B Rockfield Blvd

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY N MORSE, INC.

505 East First Street Suite H

Tustin, CA 92780-3305

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JUAN BONILLA SERVED ON 02/26/16 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JUAN BONILLA SERVED ON 02/26/16 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO VAQUERO MEAT, INC.,A CALIFORNIA SERVED ON 02/26/16 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO VAQUERO MEAT, INC.,A CALIFORNIA SERVED ON 02/26/16 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND STAY FILED BY JUAN BONILLA; BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER IS 8:16-BK-11213-ES. (ENTIRE CASE STAYED)

NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND STAY FILED BY JUAN BONILLA; BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER IS 8:16-BK-11213-ES. (ENTIRE CASE STAYED)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2016
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • UPDATE DISPOSITION OF VAQUERO MEAT, INC.,A CALIFORNIA TO BANKRUPT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND STAY FILED BY JUAN BONILLA; BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER IS 8:16-BK-11213-ES. (ENTIRE CASE STAYED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/01/2016 OF H.L FOODSERVICE, INC. FOR VAQUERO MEAT, INC.,A CALIFORNIA, JUAN BONILLA, ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY N MORSE,INC. ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JUAN BONILLA SERVED ON 02/26/16 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO VAQUERO MEAT, INC.,A CALIFORNIA SERVED ON 02/26/16 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/01/2016 OF H.L FOODSERVICE, INC., JUAN BONILLA IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY H.L FOODSERVICE, INC. FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0203 $435.00; 160201-0203-CK Reference Number #098794

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less