This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/08/2021 at 01:17:15 (UTC).

HITT PLUMBING -V- JEFFREY HOLMES

Case Summary

On 06/16/2014 HITT PLUMBING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JEFFREY HOLMES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8575

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HITT PLUMBING CO. INC

JM&M PLUMBING

HEATING-AIR, INC.

HITT PLUMBING CO. INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HEATING-AIR, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

JEFFREY HOLMES

HOLMES, JEFFREY

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARLONI, DIANA J

14390 Civic Dr; Ste B

Victorville, CA 92392

Carloni, Diana Jean

 

Court Documents

RETURN ON WRIT OF SALE FROM SB COUNTY UNSATISFIED

05/26/2016: RETURN ON WRIT OF SALE FROM SB COUNTY UNSATISFIED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

08/25/2015: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

08/03/2015: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS IN NEWSPAPER VICT

09/23/2014: ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS IN NEWSPAPER VICT

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OR POSTING O

09/18/2014: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OR POSTING O

NOTICE IMAGED

06/16/2014: NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED 140616-1067-CK CLS- 240.00

06/16/2014: COMPLAINT FILED 140616-1067-CK CLS- 240.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: RETURN ON WRIT OF SALE FROM SB COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COST OF $771.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20150825-2162; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY HITT PLUMBING CO. INC FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION 150825-2162-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 150825-2162-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3373

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - San Bernardino; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ($5,207.48/SALE OF RP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20150821-2148; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY HITT PLUMBING CO. INC FOR ABSTRACT 150821-2148-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 150821-2148-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3372

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: WRIT FOR SB, CK#3373 $25.00 IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): LINES 11-19 ON WRIT MUST BE FILLED OUT COMPLETELY AND MATCH COURT RECOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2014
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $337.00; Total Payments and Credits: $337.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • DocketPrayer for Interest Percentage at the Rate of; Comment: PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 10.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 03/19/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • DocketPrayed for Amount and/or Damages in the Amount of; Comment: PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,817.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • DocketCase Number Changed; Comment: CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM CIV/DSDS1408575

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED 140616-1067-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 140616-1067-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 2491

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEATING AND AIR INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where HITT PLUMBING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLONI DIANA JEAN