This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 03:53:08 (UTC).

HINOJO -V- TACO JOES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/09/2016 HINOJO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TACO JOES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0945

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LETICIA HINOJO

Defendants

BENJAMIN DOE

TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT

RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ

BENJAMIN ALVAREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SANDRA H. CASTRO, INC

3200 Inland Empire Blvd. Ste 265

Ontario, CA 91764

Defendant Attorney

LIGHTGABLER LLP

760 Paseo Camarrilo Ste. 300

Camarillo, CA 93010

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.

ORDER OF MOTION PURSUANT TO PRIVATE ATY GENERAL ACT FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF CIVIL PENALTIES FILED

ORDER OF MOTION PURSUANT TO PRIVATE ATY GENERAL ACT FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF CIVIL PENALTIES FILED

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT.

NOTICE NON-OPPOSITION TO MTN PURSUANT TO PRIVATE ATTY ACT FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.

NOTICE NON-OPPOSITION TO MTN PURSUANT TO PRIVATE ATTY ACT FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.

DECLARATION OF SANDRA H CASTRO IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR PAGA STTLMNT FILED

DECLARATION OF SANDRA H CASTRO IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR PAGA STTLMNT FILED

MOTION RE: FOR PAGA SETTLEMENT APPROVAL SET FOR HEARING ON 11/16/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LETICIA HINOJO (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR PAGA SETTLEMENT APPROVAL SET FOR HEARING ON 11/16/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF LETICIA HINOJO (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LETICIA HINOJO.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LETICIA HINOJO.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.

ANSWER FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LIGHTGABLER LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LIGHTGABLER LLP.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF MOTION PURSUANT TO PRIVATE ATY GENERAL ACT FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF CIVIL PENALTIES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY KRISTEN BROWN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY KATHLEEN CASTRO PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; MONET DELATORRE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ATTORNEY DELATORRE INFORMS THE COURT THAT THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT HAS BEEN SIGNED AND PAYMENT; WILL BE MADE UPON RECEIPT OF THE SIGNED ORDER.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 12/13/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • MOTION RE: FOR PAGA SETTLEMENT APPROVAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF LETICIA HINOJO; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY KRISTEN BROWN AND KATHLEEN CASTRO PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; MONET DELATORRE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; LETICIA HINOJO'S MOTION PAGA SETTLEMENT APPROVAL IS HEARD.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; COURT FINDS:; COUNSEL ADVISE THE COURT THAT THE SETTLEMENT AMOUNT IS $67,570.00 AND WILL BE DISBURSED AS; FOLLOWS: ATTORNEY FEES SOUGHT $27,028.00, $2,500.00 ALLOTED FOR PAGA SETTLEMENT, $1875.00; TO LWDA, $625.00 TO 2 AGRRIEVED EMPLOYESS WHICH WILL BE DISBURSED AT $312.50 EACH AND $621.00 IN; COSTS.; LETICIA HINOJO'S MOTION PAGA SETTLEMENT APPROVAL IS GRANTED.; PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT ORDER TO THE COURT; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE NON-OPPOSITION TO MTN PURSUANT TO PRIVATE ATTY ACT FILED BY TACO JOES MEXICAN RESTAURANT, RIGOBERTO SANCHEZ, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0036421535

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LETICIA HINOJO FOR MTN FOR PAGA STTLMNT AND FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0655 $123.00

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/09/2016 OF LETICIA HINOJO, BENJAMIN ALVAREZ IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170103-0232 $17.50; 170103-0232-CK Reference Number 39612

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • PLAINTIFF LETICIA HINOJO FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LETICIA HINOJO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161209-0513 $435.00; 161209-0513-CK Reference Number CK 1725

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less