This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 00:37:47 (UTC).

HINKS-V-VILLEGAS

Case Summary

On 04/12/2016 HINKS-V-VILLEGAS was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5257

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

HARLEIGH HINKS

AUSTIN HINKS

JADEN DEPALMA

BOBBIE HINKS

PAIGE HINKS

DUSTIN HINKS

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BOBBIE HINKS

Defendants

JULIE VILLEGAS

ROLAND MELENDEZ

JILL VILLEGAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

GREY, DAVID

6100 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1104

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Petitioner Attorney

LEGAL OFFICES OF DAVID GREY

6100 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1104

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Defendant Attorney

RAFFALOW, BRETOI &ADAMS

2280 Wardlow Circle Ste 200

Corona, CA 92880

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING PTN FOR COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM JADEN DEPALMA FILED

ORDER APPROVING PTN FOR COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM JADEN DEPALMA FILED

ORDER APPROVING PTN FOR COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM JADEN DEPALMA FILED

ORDER APPROVING PTN FOR COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM JADEN DEPALMA FILED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM PAIGE HINKS FILED

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM PAIGE HINKS FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/12/2016 OF BOBBIE HINKS BY BOBBIE HINKS.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/12/2016 OF BOBBIE HINKS BY BOBBIE HINKS.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

MOTION RE: AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL SET FOR HEARING ON 06/01/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOBBIE HINKS (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL SET FOR HEARING ON 06/01/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOBBIE HINKS (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISMISS COMPLAINT OF BOBBIE HINKS, JADEN DEPALMA, PAIGE HINKS, DUSTIN HINKS, HARLEIGH HINKS, AUSTIN HINKS, ON 02/28/17

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BOBBIE HINKS.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BOBBIE HINKS.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ROLAND MELENDEZ, JILL VILLEGAS.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ROLAND MELENDEZ, JILL VILLEGAS.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ROLAND MELENDEZ, JILL VILLEGAS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ROLAND MELENDEZ, JILL VILLEGAS

ANSWER FILED BY ROLAND MELENDEZ, JILL VILLEGAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY RAFFALOW, RHOADS &BRETOI.

ANSWER FILED BY ROLAND MELENDEZ, JILL VILLEGAS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY RAFFALOW, RHOADS &BRETOI.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JULIE VILLEGAS SERVED ON 06/01/16 WITH FEES OF $80.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JULIE VILLEGAS SERVED ON 06/01/16 WITH FEES OF $80.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROLAND MELENDEZ SERVED ON 06/01/16 WITH FEES OF $80.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROLAND MELENDEZ SERVED ON 06/01/16 WITH FEES OF $80.50.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 01/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; B. TAM NOMOTO SCHUMANN, JUDGE; (JUDGE AWAY FROM COURT: CLERKS CALENDAR HELD); CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PROOF OF DEPOSIT FILED THIS DATE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 01/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; B. TAM NOMOTO SCHUMANN, JUDGE; (JUDGE AWAY FROM COURT: CLERKS CALENDAR HELD); CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS FILED THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; B. TAM NOMOTO SCHUMANN, JUDGE; (JUDGE AWAY FROM COURT: CLERKS CALENDAR HELD); CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS FILED THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • ORDER APPROVING MINORS COMP IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SUBMITTED ORDERS DO NOT MATCH COURT ORDERS *.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM PAIGE HINKS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT JADEN DEPALMA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT PAIGE HINKS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPROVING PTN FOR COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM JADEN DEPALMA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY CHERYL HOUDE FOR DAVID GREY FOR PLTFS B HINKS/J DEPALMA/P HINKS.; ATTORNEY MICHELLE WELLS PRESENT FOR DEFTS MELENDEZ/J VILLEGAS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; WITNESS -- BOBBIE HINKS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT FINDS THAT PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR IS IN THE BEST INTEREST OF PAIGE HINKS.; THE COURT FINDS THAT PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR IS NECESSARY AND IN THE BEST INTEREST OF PAIGE HINKS.; SETTLEMENT APPROVED IN THE SUM OF $7,500.00; ATTORNEY FEES OF $1,564.45 AND EXPENSES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,921.23 ARE APPROVED.; THE BALANCE OF $3,014.32 IS ORDERED DEPOSITED IN A TRUST ACCOUNT WITH THE PETITIONER AS TRUSTEE AT WELLS FARGO 2500 S GROVE AVE ONTARIO CA 92761 WITH NO FUNDS TO BE WITHDRAWN WITHOUT FIRST OBTAINING ORDER OF COURT.; ORDERS APPROVING COMPROMISE AND TO DEPOSIT FUNDS ARE SIGNED BY THE COURT.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF PROOF OF DEPOSIT/PROOF OF ANNUITY SET FOR 01/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED PROVIDED RETURN IS FILED WITH THE COURT PRIOR TO DATE OF CONTINUANCE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - MISCELLANEOUS PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 06/09/2017 OF BOBBIE HINKS ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2016
  • PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR PAIGE HINKS IS BOBBIE HINKS -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY BRIAN S MCCARVILLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR DUSTIN HINKS IS BOBBIE HINKS -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY BRIAN S MCCARVILLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR HARLEIGH HINKS IS BOBBIE HINKS -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY BRIAN S MCCARVILLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR AUSTIN HINKS IS BOBBIE HINKS -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY BRIAN S MCCARVILLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY BOBBIE HINKS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160412-0570 $435.00; 160412-0570-CK Reference Number #40948

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.