This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:07:26 (UTC).

HILL -V- TOLLEY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 HILL -V- TOLLEY was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9402

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDITH HILL

Defendants

TAYLOR GARCIA

KEVIN TOLLEY,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAZIRI LAW GROUP, APC

5757 Wilshire Blvd Suite 670

Los Angeles, CA 90036

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0086 $435.00; 171004-0086-CK Reference Number 21598

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO TAYLOR GARCIA SERVED ON 10/22/17 WITH FEES OF $130.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO TAYLOR GARCIA SERVED ON 10/22/17 WITH FEES OF $130.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KEVIN TOLLEY, SERVED ON 10/22/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KEVIN TOLLEY, SERVED ON 10/22/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO TAYLOR GARCIA SERVED ON 10/22/17 WITH FEES OF $130.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KEVIN TOLLEY, SERVED ON 10/22/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0086 $435.00; 171004-0086-CK Reference Number 21598

    Read MoreRead Less