This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/29/2018 at 08:40:22 (UTC).

HILL V PEP BOYS

Case Summary

On 11/04/2013 HILL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEP BOYS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2427

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIMOTHY HILL

Defendant

THE PEP BOYSMANNY MOE & JACK OF CA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2013
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TIMOTHY HILL FOR 1ST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 131216-0259 $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:48; 10:46; ROBERT G FOWLER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CATHY HOWDEN; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF TIMOTHY HILL PRESENT; THE PEP BOYSMANNY MOE & JACK OFCA REPRESENTED BY BEN MENDOZA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; 13A*PDE.; WITNESS -- TIMOTHY HILL IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- BEN MENDOZA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION; SUBSEQUENTLY:; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 11/04/2013 OF TIMOTHY HILL AS FOLLOWS:; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYSMANNY MOE & JACK OFCA; AND AGAINST TIMOTHY HILL; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY CLERKS OFFICE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO THE PEP BOYSMANNY MOE & JACK OFCA; PARTY SERVED ON 11/08/13 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO V15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY TIMOTHY HILL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF TIMOTHY HILL IS DENIED.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEPBOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CA. THE is a litigant