This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 23:38:12 (UTC).

HIDALGO -VS- VAZQUEZ

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 HIDALGO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VAZQUEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3104

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL HIDALGO

Defendant

RAUL VAZQUEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN FILE FOR PICK UP)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN FILE FOR PICK UP)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/10/2017 OF DANIEL HIDALGO ORDERED ENTERED 06/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DANIEL HIDALGO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RAUL VAZQUEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RAUL VAZQUEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RAUL VAZQUEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RAUL VAZQUEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RAUL VAZQUEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/19/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RAUL VAZQUEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/19/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/16/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/16/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN FILE FOR PICK UP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170615-0380 $25.00; 170615-0380-CK Reference Number 9053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/10/2017 OF DANIEL HIDALGO ORDERED ENTERED 06/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DANIEL HIDALGO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RAUL VAZQUEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RAUL VAZQUEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RAUL VAZQUEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/10/2017 OF DANIEL HIDALGO AS TO RAUL VAZQUEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • PROOF RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.--BEGINNING ON 03/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170510-0203 $255.00; 170510-0203-CK Reference Number CK

    Read MoreRead Less