This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 05:01:38 (UTC).

HFD -V- FREDIEU

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 HFD -V- FREDIEU was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1648

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HESPERIA FIRE DEPARTMENT

Defendant

DAVON FREDIEU

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO DAVON FREDIEU. PARTY SERVED ON 10/23/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $33.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO DAVON FREDIEU. PARTY SERVED ON 10/23/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $33.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; 09:15; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; HESPERIA FIRE DEPARTMENT REPRESENTED BY DARLENE PARDUE.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DAVON FREDIEU; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; DAVON FREDIEU HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST DAVON FREDIEU.; JUDGMENT FOR: HESPERIA FIRE DEPARTMENT; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DAVON FREDIEU; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,022.07 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $133.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,155.07; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO DAVON FREDIEU. PARTY SERVED ON 10/23/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $33.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR HESPERIA FIRE DEPARTMENT ARE WAIVED FOR CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less