Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 14:52:05 (UTC).

HETT VS JONES

Case Summary

On 10/27/2011 HETT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JONES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2378

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HETT INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

Defendant

BRIAN JONES

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNY TAN

640 N. Diamond Bar Blvd

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO PLAINTIFF IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 120112-2814 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 10/27/2011 OF HETT INVESTMENT GROUP LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/12/12; JUDGMENT FOR: HETT INVESTMENT GROUP LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRIAN JONES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: BRIAN JONES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BRIAN JONES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 10/27/2011 OF HETT INVESTMENT GROUP LLC AS TO BRIAN JONES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • DEFAULT /WRIT PACKET RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • REQUEST TO SET RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 111208-2382 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • POSTING ORDER RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • POSTING ORDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MISSING SIGNATURE AND FEE $20 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • POSTING ORDER RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE AS TO UNKNOWNS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING RETURNED UNDELIVRABLE AS TO BRIAN JONES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 111027-1051 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HETT INVESTMENT GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF