This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 07:00:55 (UTC).

HESTON-V-LARGARTICHA

Case Summary

On 02/28/2011 HESTON-V-LARGARTICHA was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0173

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

DANIEL HESTON

STACEY HESTON

Defendants and Others

BRIAN LARGARTICHA

DANIEL HESTON

STACEY HESTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2012
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 08/30/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC120 FILED AS TO DANIEL HESTON. PARTY SERVED ON 04/05/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC120 FILED AS TO STACEY HESTON. PARTY SERVED ON 04/05/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY BRIAN LARGARTICHA; Minutes; Receipt: 110404-5590 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO BRIAN LARGARTICHA. PARTY SERVED ON 03/08/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110301-2053 $75.00; 110301-2053-CK Reference Number 3820

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.