This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 19:50:46 (UTC).

HERRERA -V- MANHEIM

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 HERRERA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MANHEIM. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8331

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROES 1-10 INCLUSIVE

GREGORY THOMAS

ELEANOR HERRERA

DAVID HOYTE

Defendant

MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON LAW LLP

10951 Sorrento Valley Road Suite 1G

San Diego, CA 92121-1613

Defendant Attorney

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DEF NOTICE OF FULFILLMENT OF OBLIGATION TO MEET AND CONFER RE:MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FILED.

DEF NOTICE OF FULFILLMENT OF OBLIGATION TO MEET AND CONFER RE:MOTION FOR JUDGMENT FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPO TO MTN, RJN BY MAIL ON 11/09/17 AS TO SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPO TO MTN, RJN BY MAIL ON 11/09/17 AS TO SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON, FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 11/28/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELEANOR HERRERA, DAVID HOYTE, GREGORY THOMAS (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 11/28/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ELEANOR HERRERA, DAVID HOYTE, GREGORY THOMAS (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 11/28/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 11/28/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ELEANOR HERRERA.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ELEANOR HERRERA.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ELEANOR HERRERA.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ELEANOR HERRERA.

ANSWER FILED BY MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ELEANOR HERRERA

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ELEANOR HERRERA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA. PARTY SERVED ON 01/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA. PARTY SERVED ON 01/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED.

REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JEFFREY JACKSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ELEANOR HERRERA, DAVID HOYTE, GREGORY THOMAS.; ATTORNEY THOMAS KAUFMAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: DISMISSAL.; COURT FINDS:; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PARTIES, TO FINALIZE SETTLEMENT.; IF A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING, NO APPEARANCE IS REQUIRED.; ALTERNATIVELY, IF NO APPEARANCE IS MADE THE COURT WILL DISMISS THIS MATTER WITH PREJUDICE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 05/02/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT R MITTAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JEFFREY JACKSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ELEANOR HERRERA, DAVID HOYTE, GREGORY THOMAS.; ATTORNEY THOMAS KAUFMAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; REPORTER WAIVED; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REPRESENTS THAT MATTER HAS SETTLED AND REQUESTS THAT THE COURT SET THIS; MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL.; COURT FINDS:; REQUEST GRANTED.; IF A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING, NO APPEARANCE IS REQUIRED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (SETTLED) SET FOR 04/02/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • ON COURT'S MOTION, THE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE HEARING PRESENTLY SET IN THIS CASE, IS ORDERED RESET FOR 02/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26. NOTICE SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • MOTION RE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO PLTFFS SEVENTH CAUSE OF ACTION FILED BY DEFENDANT MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT D RICE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JEFFREY JACKSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ELEANOR HERRERA, DAVID HOYTE.; ATTORNEY THOMAS KAUFMAN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLDNGS AS TO 7TH COA IS HEARD.; COURT RECITES TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF LETTER ITSELF IS GRANTED.; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF CERTAIN SUPERIOR COURT RULINGS OF SIMILAR ISSUES IS GRANTED.; MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO PLAINTIFFS SEVENTH CAUSE OF ACTION IS GRANTED; WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/25/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S26; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2016
  • HEARING RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; COURT HAS READ AND REVIEWED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC IN CASE; CIVDS 1618331.; COURT DEEMS CIVDS 1618331 AND CIVDS 1616773 RELATED, BUT NOT CONSOLIDATED. CIVDS 1618331 IS; TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT S26 FOR ALL PURPOSES.; CIVDS 1618331 IS NOT DESIGNATED AS COMPLEX.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ON 05/03/17 IS VACATED AND CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ON 01/04/17 TO BE HEARD WITH CIVDS 1616773.; HEARINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/04/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26; VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/03/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 12/21/16 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY MANHEIM INVESTMENTS, INC A NEVADA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • PLAINTIFF ELEANOR HERRERA, DAVID HOYTE, GREGORY THOMAS, ROES 1-10 INCLUSIVE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ELEANOR HERRERA, DAVID HOYTE, GREGORY THOMAS, ROES 1-10 INCLUSIVE FOR NEW FILING/FAX/COPY/MAILING AND POSTAGE; Minutes; Receipt: 161031-0064 $452.69; 161031-0064-VS Reference Number 025-0059627494

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.