This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 11:47:57 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ VS RAYGOSA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 HERNANDEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAYGOSA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0973

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LISSETTE HERNANDEZ

HUMBERTO LLANES

Defendant

RAUL RAYGOSA

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:18; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF LISSETTE HERNANDEZ, HUMBERTO LLANES PRESENT; RAUL RAYGOSA REPRESENTED BY VERA RAYGOSA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- LISSETTE HERNANDEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; WITNESS -- HUMBERTO LLANES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- VERA RAYGOSA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 02/01/2016 OF LISSETTE HERNANDEZ ORDERED ENTERED 04/01/16; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT RAUL RAYGOSA; AND AGAINST LISSETTE HERNANDEZ, HUMBERTO LLANES; 11:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0344 $50.00

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO RAUL RAYGOSA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/03/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO RAUL RAYGOSA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/03/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF RAUL RAYGOSA FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF RAUL RAYGOSA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/05/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF RAUL RAYGOSA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:18; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF LISSETTE HERNANDEZ, HUMBERTO LLANES PRESENT; RAUL RAYGOSA REPRESENTED BY VERA RAYGOSA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- LISSETTE HERNANDEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; WITNESS -- HUMBERTO LLANES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- VERA RAYGOSA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 02/01/2016 OF LISSETTE HERNANDEZ ORDERED ENTERED 04/01/16; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT RAUL RAYGOSA; AND AGAINST LISSETTE HERNANDEZ, HUMBERTO LLANES; 11:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO RAUL RAYGOSA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/03/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0344 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less