This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/26/2021 at 14:29:02 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ-V-GREENTREE SENIOR

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 HERNANDEZ-V-GREENTREE SENIOR was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1985

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Foster, Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUSANA HERNANDEZ

HERNANDEZ, SUSANA

Defendants

GREENTREE SENIOR APARTMENTS II

VPM MANAGEMENT, INC

GREENTREE SENIOR APARTMENTS II A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

VPM MANAGEMENT, INCA CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Does 1 through 20

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF CARLOS A. LLOREDA, JR.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CARLOS A. LLOREDA, JR.

4311 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 406

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

RUZICKA, WALLACE & COUGHLIN, LLP

Attorney at RUZICKA, WALLACE & COUGHLIN, LLP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

04/22/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Amended Complaint Filed

04/22/2021: Amended Complaint Filed

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

04/09/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

04/09/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Ruling on Submitted Matter

04/09/2021: Ruling on Submitted Matter

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/09/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/09/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

04/09/2021: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

04/09/2021: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/09/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

03/23/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Proof of Service Filed

03/19/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

03/19/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Declaration Filed

02/25/2021: Declaration Filed

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

02/25/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

02/25/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

02/25/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

02/25/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialHERNANDEZ, SUSANA; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-21470; HERNANDEZ, SUSANA; $24.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialHERNANDEZ, SUSANA; Transaction Assessment; $24.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketElectronic Service; Served: 04/21/2021; Served: 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Comment: 1st Amended Complaint; Electronic Service (Attached to Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint Filed; Comment: 1st Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLeave to Amend Granted for

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: Copy of RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • FinancialGREENTREE SENIOR APARTMENTS II A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; Total Financial Assessment: $568.00; Total Payments and Credits: $568.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • FinancialHERNANDEZ, SUSANA; Total Financial Assessment: $35.04; Total Payments and Credits: $35.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY SUSANA HERNANDEZ FOR FAX FEE 201022-0341-VS FAX/ 26.00 PAYMT 201022-0341-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 035-0040265078

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY SUSANA HERNANDEZ FOR FILING FEE 201022-0339-VS CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 201022-0339-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 035-0040265078

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where VPM MANAGEMENT, INC is a litigant