This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 19:42:00 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ -V- CENTIMARK

Case Summary

On 02/16/2017 HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CENTIMARK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3020

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NANCY HERNANDEZ

Defendants

JEFF JOHNSON

JUAN PARDES

JULIO RAMOS

WARREN WILSON

CENTIMARK

DANIEL HERNANDEZ

JOE URBANIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SANDRA H. CASTRO, INC

3200 Inland Empire Blvd. Ste 265

Ontario, CA 91764

Defendant Attorney

GORDON & REES

633 West Fifth Street 52Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2007

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (POST MEDIATION); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NANCY HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NANCY HERNANDEZ FOR FAX AND POSTAGE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180206-0606 $5.71; 180206-0606-VS Reference Number 033-0052911147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (POST MEDIATION); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/16/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JEFF JOHNSON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $25.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0011214652

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NANCY HERNANDEZ FOR FAX,P&E,CONFORMED; Minutes; Receipt: 170222-0060 $30.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NANCY HERNANDEZ FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170222-0052 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less