This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:10:49 (UTC).

HERMANO-V-LIVE NATION, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/19/2018 HERMANO-V-LIVE NATION, INC was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7330

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA HERMANO

Defendants

NF LEASING INC.

LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC.

CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO

PAVILION PARTNERS

STATE ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC.

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

LIVE NATION, INC.

ARAMARK SPORTS ANDENTERTAINMENT SERVICES,

ARAMARK FHC SPORTSAND ENTERTAINMENT SERVIC

LINE NATION WORLDWIDE, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS PERSONAL INJURY LAWYERS, INC.

355 South Grand Ave. Suite 2450

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

HEWITT & TRUSZKOWSKI

21550 Oxnard Street Suite 880

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE JURY FEES FILED BY MARIA HERMANO.

NOTICE JURY FEES FILED BY MARIA HERMANO.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MARIA HERMANO

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MARIA HERMANO

ANSWER FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HEWITT & TRUSZKOWSKI.

ANSWER FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HEWITT & TRUSZKOWSKI.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON TSC FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON TSC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED AS TO COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. PARTY SERVED ON 04/19/19. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED AS TO COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. PARTY SERVED ON 04/19/19. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $85.00.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PAVILION PARTNERS, STATE ENVIRONMENTALMANAGEMENT,INC., ARAMARK SPORTS ANDENTERTAINMENT SERVICES,, ARAMARK FHC SPORTSAND ENTERTAINMENT SERVIC, NF LEASING INC., CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PAVILION PARTNERS, STATE ENVIRONMENTALMANAGEMENT,INC., ARAMARK SPORTS ANDENTERTAINMENT SERVICES,, ARAMARK FHC SPORTSAND ENTERTAINMENT SERVIC, NF LEASING INC., CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LINE NATION WORLDWIDE, INC.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LINE NATION WORLDWIDE, INC.

ANSWER FILED BY LINE NATION WORLDWIDE, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HEWITT & TRUSZKOWSKI.

ANSWER FILED BY LINE NATION WORLDWIDE, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HEWITT & TRUSZKOWSKI.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO SERVED ON 10/31/18 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO SERVED ON 10/31/18 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO SERVED ON 10/31/18 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO SERVED ON 10/31/18 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/31/18 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/31/18 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LIVE NATION, INC. SERVED ON 10/26/18 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LIVE NATION, INC. SERVED ON 10/26/18 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR MARIA HERMANO.; Minutes; Receipt: 190626-0571 $150.00; 190626-0571-CK Reference Number 9731

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE JURY FEES FILED BY MARIA HERMANO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: MONIQUE DE LA ROSA; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ELENA SCHIONNING APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARIA HERMANO.; ATTORNEY ANDREW RISSLER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANTS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFF COUNSEL REPRESENTS THEY ARE READY FOR TRIAL AND AMENABLE TO MEDIATION.; DEFENDANT COUNSEL REPRESENTS IS ALSO READY FOR TRIAL AND AMENABLE TO MEDIATION.; TRIAL REQUESTED.; COURT ORDERS PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER FOLLOWING TODAYS HEARING IN REGARDS TO MEDIATION. IF COURT; SPONSORED MEDIATION IS AGREED UPON AND A MUTUALLY AGREED UPON DATE AND TIME IS SELECTED,; COUNSEL MAY CALL DEPARTMENT S27 DIRECTLY TO RESERVE A MEDIATION DATE. MEDIATION BRIEFS TO BE; FILED 5 COURT DAYS BEFORE THE HEARING. COUNSELS ARE FURTHER INSTRUCTED TO BRING EXTRA COPIES TO; THE MEDIATION HEARING IN THE EVENT THEY ARE NECESSARY.; PRIVATE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE IS 9/30/20; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS TO BE SENT BY DEFENSE.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 11/12/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 11/16/20 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MARIA HERMANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HEWITT & TRUSZKOWSKI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON TSC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED AS TO COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. PARTY SERVED ON 04/19/19. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/31/18 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LIVE NATION, INC. SERVED ON 10/26/18 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARIA HERMANO FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 181019-0573 $435.00; 181019-0573-CK Reference Number 14446

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • PLAINTIFF MARIA HERMANO FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.