Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/25/2020 at 10:04:54 (UTC).

HEE WOO LEE -V- PATRICK IN HWAN CHOI

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 HEE WOO LEE filed an Other lawsuit against PATRICK IN HWAN CHOI. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7085

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEE WOO LEE

Defendant

PATRICK IN HWAN CHOI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD SONG, ESQ.

6230 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 157

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF S. CALVIN MYUNG

3700 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • HearingDept: S27; Action text: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAction Text: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF TRANSFER OF CASE FROM LA SUPERIOR COURT TO SAN BERNARDINO SUP CT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketAction Text: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketAction Text: FILING FEE PAID BY HEE WOO LEE FOR TRANSFER; Minutes; Receipt: 200824-0153 $435.00; 200824-0153-CK Reference Number 6556

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER FROM SUPERIOR COURT CO OF LA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketAction Text: MINUTE ORDER (071020) RE: MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (GRANTED) MTN TO FILE FAC (DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAction Text: RULING: 07/10/20 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAction Text: MINUTE ORDER (070220) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketAction Text: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PATRICK IN HWAN CHOI; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/05/19 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAction Text: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAction Text: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY HEE WOO LEE IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAction Text: FILING FEE WAIVED ON HEE WOO LEE FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAction Text: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY HEE WOO LEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAction Text: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAction Text: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAction Text: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less