This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 05:00:07 (UTC).

HAWKINGS-V-BURT

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 HAWKINGS-V-BURT was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1642

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREG HAWKINGS

Defendant

BENIOT BURT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MICHAEL A. CAMBER, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GREG HAWKINGS PRESENT; DEFENDANT BENIOT BURT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:15; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; WITNESS -- GREG HAWKINGS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW AND SUBSEQUENTLY RETURNED TO OFFERING PARTY.; WITNESS -- BENIOT BURT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW AND SUBSEQUENTLY RETURNED TO OFFERING PARTY.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AND SUBSEQUENTLY RULED UPON.; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF GREG HAWKINGS ORDERED ENTERED 12/11/17; JUDGMENT FOR: GREG HAWKINGS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BENIOT BURT; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $460.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $460.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY CLERKS OFFICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO BENIOT BURT. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO BENIOT BURT. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GREG HAWKINGS PRESENT; DEFENDANT BENIOT BURT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:51; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/11/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 12/13/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MICHAEL A. CAMBER, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GREG HAWKINGS PRESENT; DEFENDANT BENIOT BURT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:15; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; WITNESS -- GREG HAWKINGS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW AND SUBSEQUENTLY RETURNED TO OFFERING PARTY.; WITNESS -- BENIOT BURT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW AND SUBSEQUENTLY RETURNED TO OFFERING PARTY.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AND SUBSEQUENTLY RULED UPON.; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF GREG HAWKINGS ORDERED ENTERED 12/11/17; JUDGMENT FOR: GREG HAWKINGS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BENIOT BURT; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $460.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $460.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY CLERKS OFFICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GREG HAWKINGS PRESENT; DEFENDANT BENIOT BURT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:51; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/11/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO BENIOT BURT. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GREG HAWKINGS IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON GREG HAWKINGS FOR FIRST APPEARANCE/NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY GREG HAWKINGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less