This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:51:11 (UTC).

HATTAR -V- ROLLING START

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 HATTAR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ROLLING START. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1271

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTHA HATTAR

Defendants

ROLLING START INCORPORATED

JOHN ANAYA

JANENE VITRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAGNER & PELAYES, LLP

1325 Spruce Street, Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92507

Defendant Attorneys

CLOUSESPANIAC ATTORNEYS

8038 Haven Av Ste E

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

MEYERS FOZI & DWORK, LLP

1808 Aston Avenue Suite 100

Carlsbad, CA 92008

 

Court Documents

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JANENE VITRO

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JANENE VITRO

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JANENE VITRO

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JANENE VITRO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AT ISSUE MEMO BY MAIL ON 12/21/17 AS TO SEE ATTACHED LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AT ISSUE MEMO BY MAIL ON 12/21/17 AS TO SEE ATTACHED LIST, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY ROLLING START INCORPORATED, JOHN ANAYA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CLOUSESPANIAC ATTORNEYS.

ANSWER FILED BY ROLLING START INCORPORATED, JOHN ANAYA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CLOUSESPANIAC ATTORNEYS.

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF DEFS MTN TO MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/30/17 FILED BY JANENE VITRO. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF DEFS MTN TO MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/30/17 FILED BY JANENE VITRO. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE SET FOR HEARING ON 10/30/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT ROLLING START INCORPORATED (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE SET FOR HEARING ON 10/30/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT ROLLING START INCORPORATED (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/30/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTHA HATTAR (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/30/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTHA HATTAR (IMAGED)

PLAS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE FILED.

PLAS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE FILED.

PLAS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE FILED.

PLAS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE BY MAIL ON 09/06/17 AS TO SEE ATTACHED, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE BY MAIL ON 09/06/17 AS TO SEE ATTACHED, FILED.

MOTION RE: STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/30/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT JANENE VITRO (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/30/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT JANENE VITRO (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY JANENE VITRO

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY JANENE VITRO

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MARTHA HATTAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARTHA HATTAR FOR FAX, EVP, COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 180409-0041 $4.21; 180409-0041-VS Reference Number 06241G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JACOB MENICUCCI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY LAWYA RANGEL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT ROLLING START INCORPORATED.; ATTORNEY JEREMY DWORK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JANENE VITRO.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; REASON: MORE TIME NEEDED TO POSSIBLY ATTEND PRIVATE MEDIATION AND MORE TIME NEEDED TO; RESOLVE ISSUES WITH WITNESSES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • NOT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JURY FEES WERE PAID FOR THIS PARTY ON 06/21/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170117-0464 $4.00; 170117-0464-VS Reference Number 026-0003502016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PLAINTIFF MARTHA HATTAR FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARTHA HATTAR FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0216 $25.00; 161215-0216-VS Reference Number 026-0001628018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARTHA HATTAR FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0213 $435.00; 161215-0213-VS Reference Number 026-0001628018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less