This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:01:30 (UTC).

HARWOOD GARLAND -V- ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 HARWOOD GARLAND -V- ORTEGA was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7755

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARWOOD GARLAND

Defendants

MIGUEL ORTEGA

ISELA CORDERO-ORTEGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OPERINI, EDWARD G

16820 Ivy Avenue

Fontana, CA 92335

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE (I.CORDERO-ORTEGA)/DEFAULT/ TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HARWOOD GARLAND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ISELA CORDERO-ORTEGA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/02/18 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTING OSC AND CONTINUANCE OF TSC 05/17/18 FILED BY HARWOOD GARLAND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD G OPERINI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:05; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IS STILL ATTEMPTING SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ISELA CORDERO-ORTEGA; AS TO; DEFENDANT MIGUEL ORTEGA, COUNSEL REPRESENTS SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS ARE BEING HELD.; THE COURT RESERVED JURISDICTION TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILING TO; SERVE DEFENDANT ISELA CORDERO-ORTEGA.; IF DEFENDANT ISELA CORDERO-ORTEGA IS NOT SERVED BEFORE NEXT HEARING AND PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL DOES; NOT FILE A DECLARATION ON THE MATTER, THE COURT WILL IMPOSE SANCTIONS.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SERVICE (I.CORDERO-ORTEGA)/DEFAULT/ TSC SET FOR 05/17/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:09; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MIGUEL ORTEGA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/25/18 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HARWOOD GARLAND FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0492 $380.00; 170914-0492-CK Reference Number 5015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less