Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:05:21 (UTC).

HARRIS -V- PAPA JOHN'S USA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/16/2015 HARRIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PAPA JOHN'S USA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9961

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LACHERYL D HARRIS

Defendants

PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC.

JOSHUA DANIEL LEUTHNER

J.B. FOOD INC.

PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC.'S

PJ INLAND EMPIRE ENTERPRISE INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF KOTTLER & KOTTLER

6420 Wilshire Blvd Penthouse

Los Angeles, CA 90048

THE SIMON LAW GROUP, LLP

1327 N Broadway

Santa Ana, CA 92706

BB LAW GROUP LLP

6100 Center Drive Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant Attorneys

MCVOY, ESQ, DEAN H.

650 E. Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

LA OFFICES OF LEWIS BRISBOIS

650 E Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E BISHOP

One Mac Arthur Place Ste 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

 

Court Documents

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: MIL 2 FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: MIL 2 FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: MIL 2 FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: MIL 2 FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEFENDANTS NO 3 FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEFENDANTS NO 3 FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEFENDANTS NO 1 FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEFENDANTS NO 1 FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: PLTFS NO 6 FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: PLTFS NO 6 FILED.

JOINT LISTY OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED.

JOINT LISTY OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: MIL 4 FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: MIL 4 FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUE TRIAL AND TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUE TRIAL AND TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE FILED.

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL & TRIAL READINESS DATES FILED

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL & TRIAL READINESS DATES FILED

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC.'S, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC.'S, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SEPARATELY BOUND VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT PF DEF MTN FOR MSJ FILED.

SEPARATELY BOUND VOLUME OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT PF DEF MTN FOR MSJ FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E BISHOP WITH DOUGLASS H MORI AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOSHUA DANIEL LEUTHNER.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E BISHOP WITH DOUGLASS H MORI AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOSHUA DANIEL LEUTHNER.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/16/2015 OF LACHERYL HARRIS AS TO JOSHUA DANIEL LEUTHNER, PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC.'S, PJ INLAND EMPIRE ENTERPRISE INC., ADDING ATTORNEY LA OFFICES OF LEWISBRISBOIS FILED

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/16/2015 OF LACHERYL HARRIS AS TO JOSHUA DANIEL LEUTHNER, PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC.'S, PJ INLAND EMPIRE ENTERPRISE INC., ADDING ATTORNEY LA OFFICES OF LEWISBRISBOIS FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOSHUA DANIEL LEUTHNER, PJ INLAND EMPIRE ENTERPRISE INC.,.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOSHUA DANIEL LEUTHNER, PJ INLAND EMPIRE ENTERPRISE INC.,.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 2 TO BE PJ INLAND EMPIRE ENTERPIRSE INC., FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 2 TO BE PJ INLAND EMPIRE ENTERPIRSE INC., FILED.

NOTICE OF FILING OF HOSPITAL LIEN UNDER CIVIL CODE SECTION 3045.1 ET SEQ FILED.

NOTICE OF FILING OF HOSPITAL LIEN UNDER CIVIL CODE SECTION 3045.1 ET SEQ FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150716-2494 $435.00; 150716-2494-CK Reference Number 31517

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • SUBPOENAS DESTROYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME VOL 1 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 07/16/15 AND 11/08/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • SUBPOENAED RECORDS RECEIVED FROM DMV (1 ENV).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT T SIMON AND ATTORNEY SEVY W FISHER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF LACHERYL D HARRIS PRESENT; ATTORNEY MATHEW L WALKER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL REPRESENT MATTER HAS SETTLED.; SETTLEMENT IS RECITED INTO THE RECORD.; PAYMENT TO BE MADE TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL JOINTLY WITHIN 30 DAYS. DISMISSAL TO BE; FILED AFTER RELEASE SIGNED.; ATTORNEY WALKER REQUESTS PREVIOUS MINUTE ORDER BE AMENDED TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN INFORMATION.; COURT GRANTS ATTORNEY WALKERS REQUEST.; HEARING IS SET AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (SETTLED) SET FOR 01/14/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON MEDIA REQUEST TO PERMIT COVERAGE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIA REQUEST TO PHOTOGRAPH, RECORD OR BROADCAST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MIL NO 7 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MIL NO 6 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC.'S FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 150831-2000 $435.00; 150831-2000-CK Reference Number 5646

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/16/2015 OF LACHERYL HARRIS, PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC. REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/16/2015 OF LACHERYL HARRIS, PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC.'S IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/31/15 WITH COSTS OF $57.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSHUA DANIEL LEUTHNER SERVED ON 08/10/15 WITH FEES OF $81.95.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150716-2494 $435.00; 150716-2494-CK Reference Number 31517

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAPA JOHNS USA INC is a litigant