This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/23/2018 at 22:33:40 (UTC).

GWYNNE LYNN MIHLD-V-TRAVIS DEE MIHLD

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 GWYNNE LYNN MIHLD-V-TRAVIS DEE MIHLD was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1306

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GWYNNE LYNN MIHLD

Respondent

TRAVIS DEE MIHLD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • NOE OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/04/2011 OF GWYNNE MIHLD FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/04/2011 OF GWYNNE MIHLD ORDERED ENTERED 04/20/12; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • JUGDMENT PACKET RECD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 04/18/12 BY GWYNNE LYNN MIHLD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • APPEARANCE STIPULATION WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY GWYNNE LYNN MIHLD FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY TRAVIS DEE MIHLD FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MEDIATOR DON CRIPE FROM IVJC PRESENT.; CLERK: EILEEN CHRISTIANSEN; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER GWYNNE LYNN MIHLD PRESENT; RESPONDENT TRAVIS DEE MIHLD PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; OSC/MOTION HELD.; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS SETTLED.; PARTIES HAVE JUDGMENT AND FL170 AND WILL TAKE CLERKS OFFICE TO HAVE FILED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2011
  • NTC OF MEDIATION HRG (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY GWYNNE LYNN MIHLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE BY MAIL SERV ON 08/04/11 AS TO GWYNNE MIHLD, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/04/2011 OF GWYNNE MIHLD BY TRAVIS DEE MIHLD FILED. REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.; Minutes; Receipt: 110804-1492 $395.00; 110804-1492-DI Reference Number 323139894756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TRAVIS DEE MIHLD; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/06/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PET FOR DISS OF MARRIAGE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4505 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V11

    Read MoreRead Less