Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 08:24:47 (UTC).

GUTIERREZ-V-WINDHAM

Case Summary

On 05/16/2011 GUTIERREZ-V-WINDHAM was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0361

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLORIA E GUTIERREZ

Defendant

WILLIAM E WINDHAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; CHARLES M FUERTSCH, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GLORIA E GUTIERREZ, WILLIAM E WINDHAM; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHARLES M FUERTSCH, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GLORIA E GUTIERREZ PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WILLIAM E WINDHAM; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: FOR SERVICE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/25/11 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F2C.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • STIPULATION RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONALD DENCH, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GLORIA E GUTIERREZ PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WILLIAM E WINDHAM; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF (FOR SERVICE).; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/29/11 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F2C.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • RETURN MAIL: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIVED BACK FROM DEFENDANT WINDHAM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO WILLIAM E WINDHAM. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • SENT OUT CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFT NO CHARGE FEE WAIVER ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY GLORIA E GUTIERREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GLORIA E GUTIERREZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON GLORIA E GUTIERREZ FOR SC100 IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less