Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/01/2018 at 22:33:56 (UTC).

GUTIERREZ -V- HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 05/05/2010 GUTIERREZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6151

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARD GUTIERREZ

Defendants

OLD MILL PLAZA INVESTMENTS CORPORATION

HUGO HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD WILLIAMS & ASSOCIATES

2717 Ulric Street, Ste 206

San Diego, CA 92111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 101025-1421 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • HEARING RE: OSC/SANCTIONS-FAILURE TO APPEAR/FAILURE TO SERVE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): YOUR COMPLAINT IS THE ONLY ACTION ON THIS CASE, THE DISMISSAL SHOULD BE MARKED ENTIRE ACTI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • RETURN MAIL: MINUTE ORDER FROM 08/06/10 RECEIVED BACK FROM HOWARD WILLIAMS & ASSOCIATES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; SELIM FRANKLIN PRESIDING.; CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; ATTORNEY INFORMATION; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFF HAS FAILED TO APPEAR AS REQUIRED IN THE ABSENCE OF SERVICE COMPLETION. THE COURT SETS; THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FOR; FAILURE TO SERVE. AMOUNT OF INTENDED SANCTIONS WILL BE $150.00.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: OSC/SANCTIONS-FAILURE TO APPEAR/FAILURE TO SERVE SET FOR 10/04/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF OSC/SANCTIONS TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • FILE SENT TO S35 FOR HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY EDWARD GUTIERREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY EDWARD GUTIERREZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON EDWARD GUTIERREZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $355.00.

    Read MoreRead Less